Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-5123
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-5123
Title:Cardell A. Hayes, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:July 21, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of Louisiana, Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-KA-0789)
   Decision Date:March 27, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 9, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
May 26 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 20, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Aug 18 2020Waiver of right of respondent State of Louisiana to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 27 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 16 2020Response Requested. (Due October 16, 2020)
Oct 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 16, 2020 to November 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 16, 2020.
Nov 16 2020Brief of respondent State of Louisiana in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 03 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Ramos v. Louisiana, 590 U. S. ___ (2020).
Feb 12 2021MANDATE ISSUED.
Feb 12 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark David Plaisance
    Counsel of Record
P O Box 1123
Prairieville, LA 70769

mark@plaisancelaw.com
(225) 775-5297
Party name: Cardell Hayes
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70804-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: State of Louisiana

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543