Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-493
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-493
Title:Ysleta del Sur Pueblo, et al., Petitioners
v.
Texas
Docketed:October 15, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-50400)
   Decision Date:April 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 12, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 16, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2020Waiver of right of respondent State of Texas to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/13/2020.
Nov 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of Texas, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 10 2020Response Requested. (Due December 10, 2020)
Nov 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 10, 2020 to January 11, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 11, 2021.
Jan 11 2021Brief of respondent State of Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jan 21 2021The record from the U.S.D.C. Western Dist. of Texas is electronic and located on Pacer.
Jan 25 2021Reply of petitioners Ysleta del Sur Pueblo, The Tribal Council, The Tribal Governor Michael Silvas or his Successor filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jan 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Aug 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Sep 03 2021Supplemental brief of respondent Texas filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 18 2021Petition GRANTED.
Nov 17 2021Motion for an extension of time to file respondent's brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Nov 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file respondent's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including January 10, 2022.
Dec 02 2021Brief of petitioners Ysleta del Sur Pueblo, The Tribal Council, The Tribal Governor Michael Silvas or his Successor filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main Document
Dec 09 2021Brief amicus curiae of Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of Texas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2021Brief amici curiae of National Indian Gaming Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 09 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Dec 17 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, February 22, 2022.
Dec 21 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Dec 21 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Dec 21 2021The record from the U.S.D.C. Western District of Texas is electronic and located on Pacer.
Jan 10 2022Brief of respondent Texas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 14 2022Motion of Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of Texas for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 18 2022CIRCULATED
Jan 24 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.
Jan 24 2022Motion of Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of Texas for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument DENIED.
Feb 03 2022Reply of petitioners Ysleta del Sur Pueblo, The Tribal Council, The Tribal Governor Michael Silvas or his Successor filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2022Argued. For petitioners: Brant C. Martin, Fort Worth, Tex.; and Anthony A. Yang, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Lanora C. Pettit, Principal Deputy Solicitor General, Austin, Tex.
Jun 15 2022Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Gorsuch, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Breyer, Sotomayor, Kagan, and Barrett, JJ., joined. Roberts, C. J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Thomas, Alito, and Kavanaugh, JJ., joined.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Brant C Martin
    Counsel of Record
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
100 Throckmorton Street, Suite 1500
Fort Worth, TX 76102

brant.martin@wickphillips.com
817-332-7788
Party name: Ysleta del Sur Pueblo, The Tribal Council, The Tribal Governor Michael Silvas or his Successor
Attorneys for Respondent
Lanora Christine Pettit
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Texas Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

lanora.pettit@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Texas
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Danny Scot Ashby
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1717 Main Street
Suite 3200
Dallas, TX 75201

danny.ashby@morganlewis.com
214-466-4118
Party name: Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of Texas
Danny Scot Ashby
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1717 Main Street
Suite 3200
Dallas, TX 75201

danny.ashby@morganlewis.com
(214) 466-4000
Party name: Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of Texas, National Congress of American Indians, National Indian Gaming Association, and USET Sovereignty Protection Fund
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: National Indian Gaming Association, National Congress of American Indians, and United South and Eastern Tribes Sovereignty Protection Fund

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543