SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-481
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-481
Title:
GE Capital Retail Bank, Petitioner
v.
Nyree Belton
Docketed:
October 14, 2020
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Case Numbers:
(19-648)
Decision Date:
June 16, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Oct 09 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2020)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Nov 13 2020
Brief of respondents Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A. in support filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Nov 24 2020
Waiver of right of respondent Nyree Belton; Kimberly Bruce to respond filed.
Main Document
Main Document
Dec 02 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 04 2021
Response Requested. (Due February 3, 2021)
Feb 03 2021
Brief of respondents Nyree Belton; Kimberly Bruce in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Feb 17 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Feb 17 2021
Reply of petitioner GE Capital Retail Bank filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 08 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew S. Hellman
Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001
mhellman@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: GE Capital Retail Bank
Attorneys for Respondent
George Fortune Carpinello
Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
30 South Pearl Street
Albany, NY 12207
gcarpinello@bsfllp.com
(518) 434-0600
Party name: Nyree Belton; Kimberly Bruce
Joseph Robert Guerra
Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005
jguerra@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##