Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-472
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-472
Title:HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Renewable Fuels Association, et al.
Docketed:October 13, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-9533)
   Decision Date:January 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 7, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2020Motion (20M25) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed.
Sep 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 12, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2020MOTION (20M25) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020Motion (20M25) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted.
Nov 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2020 to December 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 14, 2020, for all respondents.
Nov 11 2020Brief amici curiae of States of Wyoming, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 12 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Countrymark Refining and Logistics, LLC.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 12 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Brief of Federal Respondent in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 09 2020Brief of respondents Renewable Fuels Association, American Coalition for Ethanol, National Corn Growers Association, National Farmers Union in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 22 2020Reply of petitioners HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 08 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers GRANTED.
Jan 08 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Countrymark Refining and Logistics, LLC GRANTED.
Jan 08 2021Petition GRANTED.
Feb 11 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining, LLC, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Brief of petitioners HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining, LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Countrymark Refining and Logistics, LLC filed. (Corrected brief to be submitted - 3/12/21)
Feb 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Countrymark Refining and Logistics, LLC filed. (Corrected brief submitted - March 16, 2021).
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of States of Wyoming, et al., filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of The American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Small Refineries Coalition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 27, 2021.
Mar 15 2021Record requested.
Mar 22 2021The record received from the U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer. Sealed documents in this record has been received and electronically filed.
Mar 24 2021Brief of Federal Respondent filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 24 2021Brief of respondents Renewable Fuels Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2021Motion for divided argument filed by the Acting Solicitor General.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 30 2021CIRCULATED
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Biodiesel Board filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of Advanced Biofuels Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Growth Energy and American Farm Bureau Federation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of States of Iowa, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Coalition for Renewable Natural Gas and Producers of Renewables United for Integrity Truth and Transparency filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2021Motion for divided argument filed by respondents GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Peter D. Keisler
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

pkeisler@sidley.com
(202) 736-8027
Party name: HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining, LLC, et al.
Ryan C. MorrisSidley Austin, LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

rmorris@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew Winkle Morrison
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman
1200 Seventeenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

matthew.morrison@pillsburylaw.com
202-663-8036
Party name: Renewable Fuels Association, American Coalition for Ethanol, National Corn Growers Association, National Farmers Union
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Environmental Protection Agency
Other
Jenny R. BuchheitIce Miller LLP
One American Square, Suite 2900
lndianapolis, IN 46282

jenny.buchheit@icemiller.com
(317) 236-2295
Party name: Countrymark Refining and Logistics, LLC
Sandra Franco
    Counsel of Record
Franco Environmental Law, LLC
600 Pennsylvania Avenue, SE
#15577
Washington, DC 20003

sandra@francoenvironmentallaw.com
2022566115
Party name: Coalition for Renewable Natural Gas and Producers of Renewables United for Integrity Truth and Transparency
Andrew Michael Grossman
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

agrossman@bakerlaw.com
2028611697
Party name: The American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers
Jonathan Grant Hardin
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
700 13th Street N.W., Suite 800
Washington, DC 20005

jhardin@perkinscoie.com
(202) 654-6200
Party name: Small Refineries Coalition
Samuel Paul Langholz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1305 East Walnut Street
Des Moines, IA 50319

sam.langholz@ag.iowa.gov
515-281-8583
Party name: States of Iowa, et al.
Derek Read Molter
    Counsel of Record
Ice Miller LLP
One American Square, Suite 2900
Indianapolis, IN 46282

derek.molter@icemiller.com
(317) 236-2193
Party name: Countrymark Refining and Logistics, LLC
Rafe Petersen
    Counsel of Record
Holland and Knight LLP
800 17th Street, N.W., Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20006

rafe.petersen@hklaw.com
202 419-2481
Party name: Advanced Biofuels Association
Ethan G. Shenkman
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ethan.shenkman@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5000
Party name: National Biodiesel Board
Matthew Taylor VanWormer
    Counsel of Record
Wyoming Attorney General's Office
2320 Capitol Avenue
Cheyenne, WY 82002

matt.vanwormer@wyo.gov
3077776199
Party name: States of Wyoming, et al.,
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Growth Energy and American Farm Bureau Federation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543