Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-47
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-47
Title:Lebamoff Enterprises, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Gretchen Whitmer, et al.
Docketed:July 20, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2199, 18-2200)
   Decision Date:April 21, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 26, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 19, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2020Waiver of right of respondents Governor Gretchen Whitmer, Attorney General Dana Nessel, and MLCC Chairperson Pat Gagliard to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 23 2020Waiver of right of respondent Michigan Beer & Wine Wholesalers Association to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James Alexander Tanford
    Counsel of Record
Epstein Cohen Seif & Porter LLP
50 S. Meridian St.
Suite 505
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tanford@indiana.edu
812-332-4966
Party name: Lebamoff Enterprises, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Fadwa A. Hammoud
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

HammoudF1@michigan.gov
517-335-7628
Party name: Governor Gretchen Whitmer, Attorney General Dana Nessel, and MLCC Chairperson Pat Gagliard
Deborah A. Skakel
    Counsel of Record
Blank Rome LLP
1271 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

dskakel@blankrome.com
2128855511
Party name: Michigan Beer & Wine Wholesalers Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543