Docket for 20-450
|
Oct 07 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 9, 2020) | | PetitionCertificate of Word Count | Oct 28 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 9, 2020 to December 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 29 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 9, 2020. | | | Nov 25 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 9, 2020 to January 9, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 27 2020 | Motion to further extend the time to file a response to the petition for a writ of certiorari DENIED. | | | Dec 09 2020 | Brief of respondent Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 23 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021. | | | Dec 23 2020 | Reply of petitioners Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | Jan 19 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021. | | | Feb 12 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021. | | | Mar 09 2021 | Joint stipulation to dismiss the case pursuant Rule 46.1 filed. | | Proof of ServiceMain Document | Mar 09 2021 | Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. | | |
|