Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-445
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-445
Title:Matthew Anderson, Petitioner
v.
John Bonnewell, et al.
Docketed:October 7, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Delaware
   Case Numbers:(394, 2019)
   Decision Date:April 16, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 5, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 6, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 13 2020Waiver of right of respondent Lieutenant John Bonnewell to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 13 2020Waiver of right of respondent Correctional Officer Edgar Verde to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 07 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Christopher Gallagher
    Counsel of Record
Jacobs & Crumplar, P.A.
750 Shipyard Drive, Suite 200
Wilmington, DE 19801

pat@jcdelaw.com
(302) 656-5445
Party name: Matthew Anderson
Attorneys for Respondents
George Thomas Lees III
    Counsel of Record
Delaware Department of Justice
Carvel State Office Building, 820 North French Street, 6th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801

George.Lees@Delaware.gov
3025778859
Party name: Correctional Officer Edgar Verde
Martin B. O'Connor
    Counsel of Record
Delaware Department of Justice
820 North French Street, 7th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801

martin.oconnor@delaware.gov
3029836626
Party name: Lieutenant John Bonnewell

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543