Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-444
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-444
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Michael Andrew Gary
Docketed:October 7, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-4578)
   Decision Date:March 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 7, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 6, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Oct 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 6, 2020 to December 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 8, 2020.
Dec 08 2020Brief of respondent Michael Andrew Gary in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 08 2020Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Michael Andrew Gary.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 23 2020Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 08 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jan 08 2021Petition GRANTED.
Jan 12 2021Motion to appoint counsel filed by respondent Michael Andrew Gary.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 20 2021Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 16 2021Brief of petitioner United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 16 2021Joint appendix filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 22 2021Motion to appoint counsel filed by respondent GRANTED, and Jeffrey L. Fisher, Esq., of Stanford, California, is appointed to serve as counsel for respondent in this case.
Feb 22 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Michael Andrew Gary
Blanket ConsentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305-8610

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
(650) 724-7081
Party name: Michael Andrew Gary

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543