Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-414
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-414
Vide 20-271, 20-273, 20-74, 20-92
Title:Rovi Guides, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Comcast Cable Communications. LLC, et al.
Docketed:September 30, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1215, 2019-1216, 2019-1218, 2019-1293, 2019-1294, 2019-1295)
   Decision Date:April 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 21 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 30, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2020Brief of respondent Comcast Cable Communications, LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2020Reply of petitioner Rovi Guides, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael E. Joffre
    Counsel of Record
STERNE, KESSLER, GOLDSTEIN & Fox P.L.L.C.
1100 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

mjoffre@sternekessler.com
202-772-8856
Party name: Rovi Guides, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543