Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-408
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-408
Title:Fredman Bros. Furniture Company, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Bedgear, LLC
Docketed:September 29, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2170)
   Decision Date:October 11, 2019
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:April 29, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 25 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 29, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 29, 2020 to November 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 30, 2020.
Nov 30 2020Memorandum of respondent in Response filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jun 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 21 2021Joint stipulation of dismissal under Rule 46.1 filed.
Main Document
Jun 23 2021Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Abran J. Kean
    Counsel of Record
Erise IP, P.A.
7015 College Blvd.
Suite 700
Overland Park, KS 66211

abran.kean@eriseip.com
913-777-5600
Party name: Fredman Bros. Furniture Company, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Kenneth Lee Marshall
    Counsel of Record
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
Three Embarcadero Center
7th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

klmarshall@bclplaw.com
415-675-3444
Party name: Bedgear, LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543