SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-385
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-385
Title:
Judy Doe, Petitioner
v.
Michael L. Parson, Governor of Missouri, et al.
Docketed:
September 24, 2020
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(19-1578)
Decision Date:
June 9, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
July 15, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 26, 2020)
Petition
Proof of Service
Oct 06 2020
Waiver of right of respondent Michael L. Parson to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 30 2020
Request for recusal from counsel for petitioner received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Nov 04 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 18 2020
Response to request for recusal received.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Nov 23 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
W. James MacNaughton
Counsel of Record
W. James Mac Naughton Esq.
7 Fredon Marksboro Road
Newton, NJ 07860
wjm@wjmesq.com
732-634-3700
Party name: Judy Doe
Attorneys for Respondents
D. John Sauer
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Supreme Court Building, 207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65101
john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: Michael L. Parson
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##