Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-371
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-371
Title:Care Alternatives, Petitioner
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:September 23, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3298)
   Decision Date:March 4, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 6, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 23, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2020Brief amici curiae of Hospice, Health Care, and Physician Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 23 2020Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 04 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 09 2020Response Requested. (Due December 9, 2020)
Dec 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 9, 2020 to January 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 8, 2021.
Jan 08 2021Brief of respondents New Jersey ex rel. Victoria Druding, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2021Reply of petitioner Care Alternatives filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Care Alternatives
Attorneys for Respondents
Ross Begelman
    Counsel of Record
Begelman & Orlow
411 Route 70 East, Suite 245
Cherry Hill, NJ 08034

ross.begelman@begelmanorlow.com
856-428-6020
Party name: New Jersey ex rel. Victoria Druding, et al.
Other
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.elwood@arnoldporter.com
(202) 942-5992
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States et al.
Bryan Kenneth Nowicki
    Counsel of Record
Husch Blackwell LLP
33 E. Main St., Ste. 300
Madison, WI 53703

bryan.nowicki@huschblackwell.com
6082346012
Party name: Hospice, Health Care, and Physician Organizations

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543