Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-37
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-37
Vide 20-38
Title:Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al., Petitioners
v.
Charles Gresham, et al.
Docketed:July 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5094, 19-5096)
   Decision Date:February 14, 2020
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 17, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Aug 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 17, 2020 to October 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 16, 2020.
Aug 14 2020Brief of respondent New Hampshire Department of Health and Human Services in support filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 16 2020Brief of respondents Charles Gresham, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 04 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 04 2020Reply of petitioners alex m. azar ii, secretary of health and human services, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 04 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 20-38 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Dec 04 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-37. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-37. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Dec 29 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Alex M. Azar II, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 11 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED. VIDED.
Jan 19 2021Brief of respondent New Hampshire Department of Health and Human Services in support filed (in 20-37).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2021Brief of Federal Petitioners filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 19 2021Brief of petitioner State of Arkansas filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of State of Nebraska filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2021Brief amici curiae of States of Indiana, et al., filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Government Accountability filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 29, 2021. VIDED.
Feb 04 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. D.C. Circuit.
Feb 08 2021Record from the U.S.C.A. District of Columbia Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Feb 08 2021Record from the U.S. District and Bankruptcy Courts are electronic and located on Pacer.
Feb 18 2021Brief of respondents Charles Gresham, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Motion to vacate the judgments of the court of appeals and remand, remove the cases from the March 2021 argument calendar, and to hold further briefing in abeyance filed by petitioners Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Response in opposition to request to vacate the judgments of the court of appeals from petitioner State of Arkansas filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Feb 22 2021CIRCULATED.
Feb 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Nebraska Appleseed filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 24 2021Reply in support of motion to vacate the judgments of the court of appeals and remand, remove the cases from the March 2021 argument calendar, and to hold further briefing in abeyance filed by petitioners Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 24 2021Brief amici curiae of The National Women's Law Center, et al. filed. (Distributed). VIDED
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 25 2021Amicus brief of Health Care Provider Organizations and Patient Groups not accepted for filing. (February 26, 2021 - Corrected brief to be submitted)
Feb 25 2021Brief amici curiae of Health Care Provider Organizations and Patient Groups filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2021Brief amici curiae of AARP, et al. filed. (Distributed) VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2021Brief amici curiae of Leukemia & Lymphoma Society, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2021Brief amici curiae of Texas Medical-Legal Partnerships filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 25 2021Brief amici curiae of Public Health, Healthy Policy and Medicine Deans, Chairs and Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Nos. 20-37 and 20-38 are removed from the calendar for the March 2021 argument session. VIDED.
Mar 22 2021Reply of petitioners Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. filed. VIDED (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Mar 22 2021Reply of petitioner State of Arkansas filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2021Upon consideration of the motion of petitioners to vacate the judgments of the court of appeals and remand, to remove the cases from the March 2021 argument calendar, and to hold further briefing in abeyance, these cases are held in abeyance pending further order of the Court. VIDED.
Jun 11 2021Letter of Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
501-682-6302
Party name: State of Arkansas
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ian Heath Gershengorn
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IGershengorn@jenner.com
202-639-6869
Party name: Charles Gresham, et al.
Laura E. B. Lombardi
    Counsel of Record
New Hampshire Department of Justice
33 Capitol Street
Concord, NH 03301-6397

laura.lombardi@doj.nh.gov
6032713650
Party name: New Hampshire Department of Health and Human Services
Other
Jaclyn Niccole Warr
    Counsel of Record
Stinson LLP
7700 Forsyth Blvd.
Suite 1100
Clayton, MO 63122

nicci.warr@stinson.com
301-524-2222
Party name: Nebraska Appleseed
Erin Glenn Busby
    Counsel of Record
University of Texas School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

ebusby@law.utexas.edu
7139660409
Party name: Texas Medical-Legal Partnerships
James A. Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Nebraska Attorney General's Office
2115 State Capitol
Lincoln, NE 68509

jim.campbell@nebraska.gov
402-471-2682
Party name: State of Nebraska
Kenneth Young Choe
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

ken.choe@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5675
Party name: Health Care Provider Organizations and Patient Groups
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, et al.,
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Leukemia & Lymphoma Society
Maame Gyamfi
    Counsel of Record
AARP Foundation
601 E Street NW
Washington, DC 20049

mgyamfi@aarp.org
202-434-6291
Party name: AARP, et al.
Jeffrey Matthew Harris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
202-321-4120
Party name: Foundation for Government Accountability
Judith Riccardi Nemsick
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Knight LLP
31 West 52nd Street, 12th Floor
New York, NY 10019

judith.nemsick@hklaw.com
212-513-3200
Party name: The National Women's Law Center, et al.
Edward Todd Waters
    Counsel of Record
Feldesman Tucker Leifer Fidell LLP
1129 20th Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

ewaters@feldesmantucker.com
202-466-8960
Party name: Public Health, Healthy Policy and Medicine Deans, Chairs and Scholars

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543