Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-366
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-366
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., Appellants
v.
New York, et al.
Docketed:September 22, 2020
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Southern District of New York
   Case Numbers:(20-CV-5770 (RCW) (PWH) (JMF))
   Decision Date:September 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 22 2020Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due October 22, 2020)
Jurisdictional StatementProof of Service
Sep 22 2020Motion to expedite consideration of the jurisdictional statement filed by appellants.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 25 2020Response to the motion to expedite consideration of the Jurisdictional statement requested. The response is due Monday, September 28, 2020 by noon ET.
Sep 28 2020Response to motion from appellee New York, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Reply in support of motion filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 29 2020Supplemental brief of appellees New York, et al. filed.
Main Document
Sep 30 2020Appellants’ motion to expedite consideration of the jurisdictional statement is granted in part, and appellees are directed to file a response to the jurisdictional statement on or before 5 p.m. on Wednesday, October 7, 2020.
Oct 02 2020Supplemental brief of appellants Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Oct 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Citizens United, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2020Motion to affirm filed by appellees New York et al. (Government Appellees). (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 07 2020Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellees New York Immigration Coalition, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 09 2020Supplemental brief of appellees New York Immigration Coalition, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 13 2020Reply of appellant Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 16 2020Further consideration of the question of jurisdiction is POSTPONED to the hearing of the case on the merits. The case is set for argument on Monday, November 30, 2020. Appellants’ brief on the merits, and any amicus curiae briefs in support of appellants or in support of neither party, shall be filed on or before Friday, October 30, 2020. Appellees’ briefs on the merits, and any amicus curiae briefs in support of appellees, shall be filed on or before Monday, November 16, 2020. The reply brief shall be filed by 2 p.m., Monday, November 23, 2020.
Oct 20 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, November 30, 2020.
Oct 27 2020CIRCULATED
Oct 28 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, New York Immigration Coalition, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 28 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 28 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, New York et al. (Government Appellees)
Blanket Consent
Oct 30 2020Brief of appellants Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Oct 30 2020Joint appendix filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of Alabama filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2020Brief amici curiae of States of Louisiana, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of Fair Lines America Foundation, Inc. in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of Dr. John S. Baker, Jr. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2020Brief amici curiae of Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2020Brief amici curiae of U.S. Reps. Morris Jackson “Mo” Brooks, Jr., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Nov 11 2020Any motion pertaining to the oral argument in this case shall be filed on or before Monday, November 16, 2020.
Nov 12 2020Joint motion for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument filed by appellees.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Michael L. Rosin filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief amici curiae of National School Boards Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2020Amicus brief of Local Governments not accepted for filing. (Corrected brief to be filed - November 18, 2020)
Nov 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Local Governments filed (11/19/2020). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief of appellees New York, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief of appellees New York Immigration Coalition, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Faith-Based and Immigrants' Rights Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief amici curiae of City of San Jose, California, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States House of Representatives filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Congress of American Indians filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief amici curiae of State of California, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Directors of the U.S. Census Bureau filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Businesses and Business Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Common Cause et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Ilya Somin and Sanford Levinson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor Andrew Reamer, Ph.D. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Historians of the Census filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief amici curiae of LatinoJustice PRLDEF And Twelve Amici Curiae filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2020Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief amici curiae of The League of Women Voters of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2020The joint motion of appellees for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument is GRANTED, and the time is allotted as follows: 40 minutes for the Acting Solicitor General, 20 minutes for the government appellees, and 20 minutes for the private appellees.
Nov 23 2020Reply of appellants Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 30 2020Argued. For appellants: Jeffrey B. Wall, Acting Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For government appellees: Barbara D. Underwood, Solicitor General, New York, N. Y. For private appellees: Dale E. Ho, New York, N. Y.
Dec 18 2020Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Opinion per curiam. Breyer, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Sotomayor and Kagan, JJ., joined.
Jan 19 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Dale E. Ho
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad Street
Director, Voting Rights Project
New York, NY 10004

dale.ho@aclu.org
212-549-2693
Party name: New York Immigration Coalition, et al.
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: New York et al. (Government Appellees)
Other
David Hunter Smith
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck & Untereiner LLP
2000 K Street, NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

hsmith@robbinsrussell.com
202-775-4500
Party name: Professor Andrew Reamer, Ph.D.
Leah Camille Aden
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense and Ed. Fund, Inc.
40 Rector Street
5th Floor
New York, NY 10006

laden@naacpldf.org
2129652200
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
John S. Baker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Self
5209 Sea Chase Dr., # 5
Amelia Island, FL 32034

jbaker@lsu.edu
2257735027
Party name: Dr. John S. Baker, Jr.
Richard P. Bress
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

rick.bress@lw.com
202-637-2137
Party name: City of San Jose, California, et al.
Richard Wayland Clary
    Counsel of Record
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
825 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10019

rclary@cravath.com
2124741000
Party name: Historians
Stuart Frank Delery
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

SDelery@gibsondunn.com
(202) 887-3650
Party name: Businesses and Business Organizations
Gregory L. Diskant
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler, LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

gldiskant@pbwt.com
(212) 336-2000
Party name: Common Cause et al.
Michael Nicholas Donofrio
    Counsel of Record
Stris & Maher LLP
777 S. Figueroa St., Ste. 3850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

michael.donofrio@strismaher.com
(213) 995-6800
Party name: Michael L. Rosin
Scott Andrew Eisman
    Counsel of Record
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP
601 Lexington Avenue
31st Floor
New York, NY 10022

scott.eisman@freshfields.com
212-277-4000
Party name: Ilya Somin and Sanford Levinson
Aimee Athena Feinberg
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

Aimee.Feinberg@doj.ca.gov
916-210-6003
Party name: State of California
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Members of Congress
Blaine Ian Green
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
Four Embarcadero Center, 22nd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

blaine.green@pillsburylaw.com
(415) 983-1000
Party name: THE LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF THE UNITED STATES, et al.
Christopher J. Hajec
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

chajec@irli.org
202-232-5590
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Kris William Kobach
    Counsel of Record
Kobach Law, LLC
P.O. Box 155
Lecompton, KS 66050

kkobach@gmail.com
9136385567
Party name: U.S. Reps. Morris Jackson “Mo” Brooks, Jr., Bradley Byrne, and Robert Aderholt
Celeste Lidwina Maria Koeleveld
    Counsel of Record
Clifford Chance US LLP
31 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

celeste.koeleveld@cliffordchance.com
212 878-8000
Party name: LatinoJustice PRLDEF And Twelve Amici Curiae
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

edmund.lacour@alabamaag.gov
334-242-7300
Party name: Alabama
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
Office of General Counsel, United States House of Representatives
219 Cannon House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
2022259700
Party name: United States House of Representatives
Daniel David Lewerenz
    Counsel of Record
Native American Rights Fund
1514 P Street NW, Suite D
Washington, DC 20005

lewerenz@narf.org
2027854166
Party name: National Congress of American Indians
Stephen William Miller
    Counsel of Record
Harris, Wiltshire & Grannis LLP
1919 M Street NW, Eighth Floor
Washington, DC 20036

smiller@hwglaw.com
2027301305
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops et al.
Jeremiah Lee Morgan
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

jmorgan@lawandfreedom.com
7033565070
Party name: Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, and The Presidential Coalition, LLC
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70804-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Louisiana, et al.
Francisco Maria Negron Jr.
    Counsel of Record
National School Boards Association
1680 Duke St.
Alexandria, VA 22314

fnegron@nsba.org
7038386722
Party name: National School Boards Association
Raphael Nanda Rajendra
    Counsel of Record
Office of the County Counsel, County of Santa Clara
70 West Hedding Street, East Wing, 9th Floor
San Jose, CA 95110

raphael.rajendra@cco.sccgov.org
408-299-5900
Party name: Local Governments
Heather Burnadette Repicky
    Counsel of Record
Nutter McClennen & Fish, LLP
Seaport West, 155 Seaport Boulevard
Boston, MA 02210

hrepicky@nutter.com
617-439-2000
Party name: Faith-Based and Immigrants' Rights Organizations
Brian Adair Sutherland
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith, LLP
101 2nd Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

bsutherland@reedsmith.com
415 543 8700
Party name: Former Directors of the U.S. Census Bureau
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

Jtorchinsky@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: Fair Lines America Foundation, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543