Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-362
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-362
Title:Cochlear Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Alfred E. Mann Foundation for Scientific Research, et al.
Docketed:September 17, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1201)
   Decision Date:March 16, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 18, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 14 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 19, 2020)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 17 2020Waiver of right of respondent Alfred E. Mann Foundation for Scientific Research to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 17 2020Waiver of right of respondent Advanced Bionics, LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Sep 28 2020Response Requested. (Due October 28, 2020)
Oct 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2020 to November 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 10, 2020.
Oct 27 2020Brief amici curiae of Intellectual Property Professors filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 10 2020Brief of respondents Alfred E. Mann Foundation for Scientific Research, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2020Reply of petitioners Cochlear Corporation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Dec 14 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: Cochlear Corporation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Donald Manwell Falk
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
Two Palo Alto Square, Suite 300
3000 El Camino Real
Palo Alto, CA 94306

dfalk@mayerbrown.com
650-331-2030
Party name: Advanced Bionics, LLC
Thomas M. Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
One Market Street, Spear Tower
San Francisco, CA 94105

thomas.peterson@morganlewis.com
(415) 442-1000
Party name: Alfred E. Mann Foundation for Scientific Research
Other
Mark A. Lemley
    Counsel of Record
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

mlemley@durietangri.com
(650) 723-4605
Party name: Intellectual Property Professors

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543