Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-335
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-335
Title:Maryland Reclamation Associates, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Harford County, Maryland
Docketed:September 14, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Maryland
   Case Numbers:(52, September Term, 2019)
   Decision Date:April 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 11, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 14, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 15 2020Waiver of right of respondent Harford County, Maryland to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Ralph Greiber Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Smouse and Mason LLC
225 Duke of Gloucester St.
Annapolis, MD 21401

jrg@smouseandmason.com
410-991-1233
Party name: Maryland Reclamation Associates Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrew H. Baida
    Counsel of Record
Rosenberg Martin Greenberg, LLP
25 S. Charles Street
21st Floor
Baltimore, MD 21201-0000

abaida@rosenbergmartin.com
4107276120
Party name: Harford County, Maryland

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543