Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-334
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-334
Title:City of San Antonio, Texas, On Behalf of Itself and All Other Similarly Situated Texas Municipalities, Petitioner
v.
Hotels.com, L.P., et al.
Docketed:September 14, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-50701)
   Decision Date:May 11, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 6, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 14, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2020Waiver of right of respondents Site59.com L.L.C. and Travelocity.com L.P. (n/k/a TVL LP) to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 28 2020Waiver of right of respondents Travelweb, LLC, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 29 2020Waiver of right of respondents Expedia, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 21 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/6/2020.
Nov 02 2020Response Requested. (Due December 2, 2020)
Dec 02 2020Brief of respondents Hotels.com L.P., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 16 2020Reply of petitioner City of San Antonio, Texas, on behalf of itself and all other similarly situated Texas municipalities filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2021Petition GRANTED.
Feb 18 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Feb 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is granted and the time is extended to and including February 24, 2021.
Feb 24 2021Brief of petitioner City of San Antonio, Texas, on behalf of itself and all other similarly situated Texas municipalities filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 24 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 03 2021Amicus brief of National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, U.S. Conference of Mayors, International City/County Management Association, and International Municipal Lawyers Association submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Alexander Dubose & Jefferson LLP
Walnut Glen Tower
8144 Walnut Hill Lane, Ste. 1000
Dallas, TX 75231

dgeyser@adjtlaw.com
214-396-0441
Party name: City of San Antonio, Texas, on behalf of itself and all other similarly situated Texas municipalities
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas M. Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
One Market Street, Spear Tower
San Francisco, CA 94105

thomas.peterson@morganlewis.com
(415) 442-1000
Party name: Expedia, Inc., Hotels.com, L.P., Hotwire, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Trip Network, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp., Travelnow.com, Inc.
Anne Marie SeibelBradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
1819 5th Avenue North
Birmingham, AL 35203

aseibel@bradley.com
205-521-8386
Party name: Travelweb, LLC, et al.
Brian S. StagnerKelly Hart & Hallman LLP
201 Main Street, Suite 2400
Fort Worth, TX 76102

brian.stagner@kellyhart.com
817-878-3567
Party name: Site59.com L.L.C. and Travelocity.com L.P. (n/k/a TVL LP)
Other
Richard A. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
1776 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

rsimpson@wiley.law
202-719-7314
Party name: National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, U.S. Conference of Mayors, International City/County Management Association, and International Municipal Lawyers Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543