Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-333
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-333
Title:Bozeman Financial LLC, Petitioner
v.
Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta, et al.
Docketed:September 14, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1018, 2019-1020)
   Decision Date:April 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 3, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 14, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 15 2020Waiver of right of respondent Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Sep 28 2020Response Requested. (Due October 28, 2020)
Oct 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2020 to November 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 27, 2020.
Nov 25 2020Brief of Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta, et al. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott E. Gant
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
1401 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

sgant@bsfllp.com
202-237-2727
Party name: Bozeman Financial LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta, et al.
Jeffrey S. BucholtzKing & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Ste 200
Washington, DC 20006

jbucholtz@kslaw.com
202-737-0500
Party name: Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543