Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-332
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-332
Title:Maggy Hurchalla, Petitioner
v.
Lake Point Phase I, LLC, et al.
Docketed:September 14, 2020
Lower Ct:District Court of Appeal of Florida, Fourth District
   Case Numbers:(4D18-1221, 4D18-1632)
   Decision Date:June 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 6, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 13, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 14, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 14, 2020 to November 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 13, 2020.
Oct 10 2020Amicus brief of Protect the Protest Task Force submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 14 2020Brief amici curiae of Bullsugar.org, et al filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jamie S. Gorelick
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

jamie.gorelick@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6500
Party name: Maggy Hurchalla
Attorneys for Respondents
Chris William Altenbernd
    Counsel of Record
Banker Lopez Gassler P.A.
501 E. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 1700
Tampa, FL 33602

caltenbernd@bankerlopez.com
(813) 574-8562
Party name: Lake Point Phase I, LLC & Lake Point Phase II, LLC
Other
Richard Joseph Grosso
    Counsel of Record
Richard Grosso PA
6919 W. Broward Blvd., Mailbox 142
Plantation, FL 33317

grosso.richard@yahoo.com
954-801-5662
Party name: Bullsugar.org, et al
Lauren C. Regan
    Counsel of Record
Civil Liberties Defense Center
1430 Willamette St. #359
Eugene, OR 97401

lregan@cldc.org
5416879180
Party name: Protect the Protest Task Force

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543