Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-330
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-330
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, Petitioner
v.
Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, et al.
Docketed:September 14, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-474)
   Decision Date:September 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 17, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 14, 2020)
Certificate of Word CountPetition
Oct 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 14, 2020 to December 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 14, 2020.
Oct 14 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman and the Judicial Education Project.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Professor Lawrence A. Hamermesh.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5. filed.
Main Document
Dec 14 2020Brief of respondents Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 23 2020Reply of petitioner Donald J. Trump, President of the United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Jan 25 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman, et al. GRANTED.
Jan 25 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Professor Lawrence A. Hamermesh GRANTED.
Jan 25 2021Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED with instructions to dismiss the case as moot. See United States v. Munsingwear, Inc., 340 U. S. 36 (1950).
Feb 26 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, et al.
Other
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
1317 W. Foothill Blvd., Suite 120
Upland, CA 91786

jeastman@claremont.org
877-855-3330
Party name: Professor Lawrence A. Hamermesh
Robert W. Ray
    Counsel of Record
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
1211 Avenue of the Americas
40th Floor
New York, NY 10036

rray@zeklaw.com
2128265321
Party name: Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman and the Judicial Education Project

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543