Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-325
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-325
Title:Whitserve LLC, Petitioner
v.
Donuts Inc., et al.
Docketed:September 11, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-2240, 2019-2241)
   Decision Date:April 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 13 2020Brief of respondents Donuts Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2020Reply of petitioner Whitserve LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/13/2020.
Nov 16 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Joseph Kosma
    Counsel of Record
Whitmyer IP Group LLC
600 Summer Street
Stamford, CT 06901

mkosma@whipgroup.com
2037030800
Party name: Whitserve LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian S. Rosenbloom
    Counsel of Record
Rothwell, Figg, Ernst & Manbeck, P.C.
607 14th Street, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20005

brosenbloom@rfem.com
2027836040
Party name: Donuts Inc., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543