Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-313
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-313
Title:Acer America Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Intellisoft, Ltd., et al.
Docketed:September 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1522)
   Decision Date:April 3, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 5, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Sep 11 2020Waiver of right of respondent Intellisoft Ltd., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ian C. Ballon
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig LLP
2450 Colorado Ave.
Suite 400E
Santa Monica, CA 90404

ballon@gtlaw.com
310-586-7700
Party name: Acer America Corporation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Aaron M. Panner
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, N.W.
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

apanner@kellogghansen.com
2023267921
Party name: Intellisoft Ltd., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543