Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-31
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-31
Title:Prince McCoy, Sr., Petitioner
v.
Tajudeen Alamu
Docketed:July 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-40856)
   Decision Date:February 11, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 17, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 06 2020Waiver of right of respondent Tajudeen Alamu to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 26 2020Response Requested. (Due September 25, 2020)
Sep 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 25, 2020 to October 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 26, 2020.
Oct 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 26, 2020 to November 25, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 25, 2020.
Nov 25 2020Brief of respondent Tajudeen Alamu in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from December 9, 2020 to December 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 07 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until December 30, 2020 granted.
Dec 29 2020Reply of petitioner Prince McCoy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Taylor v. Riojas, 592 U. S. ___ (2020) (per curiam).
Mar 26 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Samuel David Kinder Weiss
    Counsel of Record
Rights Behind Bars
416 Florida Avenue, NW
# 26152
Washington, DC 20001

sam@rightsbehindbars.org
202-455-4399
Party name: Prince McCoy
Attorneys for Respondent
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Tajudeen Alamu

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543