Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-306
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-306
Vide 20-5649
Title:Robert Olan and Theodore Huber, Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:September 9, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2811, 18-2825, 18-2867, 18-2878)
   Decision Date:December 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 10, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 9, 2020 to November 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 9, 2020.
Oct 07 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Robert Olan, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2020Brief of respondent Christopher Worrall in support filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Alternative Investment Management Association, Ltd. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 09 2020Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 9, 2020 to November 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 24, 2020.
Nov 24 2020Memorandum for the United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Reply of petitioners Robert Olan, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Kelly v. United States, 590 U. S. ___ (2020).
Feb 12 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Robert Olan, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel Martin Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

dsullivan@hsgllp.com
646-837-5132
Party name: Christopher Worrall
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street
Washington, DC 20006

mdreeben@omm.com
202-383-5400
Party name: Law Professors
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3378
Party name: Alternative Investment Management Association, Ltd.
Peter Gillies Neiman
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
7 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

peter.neiman@wilmerhale.com
212-230-8800
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543