Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-305
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-305
Title:Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, et al., Petitioners
v.
Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al.
Docketed:September 9, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-50264)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2020
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 9, 2020 to November 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 9, 2020.
Oct 09 2020Brief amici curiae of Constitutional and Health Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2020Brief of respondents Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 13 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from November 24, 2020 to December 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 13 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until December 9, 2020 granted.
Dec 08 2020Reply of petitioners Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Julie Alyssa Murray
    Counsel of Record
Planned Parenthood Federation of America
1110 Vermont Avenue NW
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20005

julie.murray@ppfa.org
(202) 973-4800
Party name: Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al.
Other
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: Constitutional and Health Law Scholars

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543