Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-303
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-303
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Jose Luis Vaello-Madero
Docketed:September 9, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1390)
   Decision Date:April 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word Count
Sep 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 9, 2020 to November 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 9, 2020.
Oct 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of Carlos Delgado Altieri, Mayor of the Municipality of Isabela, Puerto Rico filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of Gregorio Igartua (11/17/2020) filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 09 2020Brief amici curiae of Plaintiffs in Peña Martínez v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2020Response to petition from respondent Jose Luis Vaello-Madero filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Virgin Islands Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Nov 24 2020Reply of petitioner United States of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Mar 01 2021Petition GRANTED.
Mar 17 2021Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Mar 22 2021Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 1, 2021. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 16, 2021.
May 27 2021Motion for a further extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 28 2021Letter of supplement to request for further extension of time filed.
Main Document
May 28 2021Motion for a further extension of time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is further extended to and including June 7, 2021. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is further extended to and including August 30, 2021.
Jun 07 2021Brief of petitioner United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 07 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of cost filed.)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of Interamerican Institute for Constitutional Rights in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 14 2021Informative of Gregorio Igartua not accepted for filing. (July 23, 2021)
Aug 21 2021Brief amici curiae of Plaintiff in Ruiz-Aviles v. SSA, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2021Brief of respondent Jose Luis Vaello-Madero filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 31 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, United States of America
Blanket Consent
Sep 02 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Jose Luis Vaello-Madero
Blanket Consent
Sep 02 2021Brief amicus curiae of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 03 2021Brief amici curiae of AARP, AARP Foundation, Justice in Aging, National Organization of Social Security Claimants’ Representatives filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 03 2021Brief amici curiae of The Service Employees International Union (SEIU), et al., filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amici curiae of Plaintiffs in Peña Martínez v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amici curiae of Puerto Rico Governor Pedro Pierluisi and the New Progressive Party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amici curiae of The District of Columbia, Guam, and 16 other states and territories. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of University of Puerto Rico Amicus Justitiae Probono Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amici curiae of National Disability Rights Network, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of Hon. Jenniffer A. Gonzalez Colon, Resident Commissioner for Puerto Rico filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of U.S. Citizens for Equal Protection, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of Government of the U.S. Virgin Islands filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Products Association of Puerto Rico filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of Senate of Puerto Rico filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of League of United Latin American Citizens filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of Diálogo Por Puerto Rico filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amici curiae of LatinoJustice PRLDEF, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amici curiae of Public Benefits Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of Virgin Islands Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amici curiae of Puerto Rico House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Amicus brief of Members of the Congressional Shadow Delegation of Puerto Rico submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 08 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, November 9, 2021.
Sep 21 2021CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Attorneys for Respondent
Hermann Ferre
    Counsel of Record
Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt and Mosle LLP
101 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10178

hferre@curtis.com
2126968871
Party name: Jose Luis Vaello-Madero
Other
Loren L. AliKhan
    Counsel of Record
D.C. Office of the Attorney General
Office of the Solicitor General
400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001

loren.alikhan@dc.gov
202-727-6287
Party name: The District of Columbia, Guam, and 16 other states and territories.
Nicole G. Berner
    Counsel of Record
Service Employees International Union
1800 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20036

nicole.berner@seiu.org
2027307000
Party name: The Service Employees International Union (SEIU), et al.,
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Puerto Rico Governor Pedro Pierluisi and the New Progressive Party
Adriel I. Cepeda Derieux
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

ACepedaDerieux@aclu.org
(212) 549-2500
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Geoffrey Paul Eaton
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
1901 L Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

geaton@winston.com
202-282-5705
Party name: U.S. Virgin Islands
Veronica Ferraiuoli Hornedo
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Resident Commissioner for Puerto Rico
2338 Rayburn House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515

vero@mail.house.gov
2022252615
Party name: Hon. Jenniffer A. Gonzalez Colon, Resident Commissioner for Puerto Rico
Jose R. Gonzalez-Irizarry
    Counsel of Record
JRGI Law LLC
1228 Calle Tomás Agrait
Club Manor
San Juan, PR 00924

jrgilawllc@gmail.com
7875659786
Party name: U.S. Citizens for Equal Protection, Inc.
Archie Jennings Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Disablilty Rights Center of the Virgin Islands
9003 Havensight Mall
Suite 313
St. Thomas, VI 00802

archie@drcvi.org
3407764303
Party name: National Disability Rights Network, et al.
Barbara A. Jones
    Counsel of Record
AARP
601 EStreet, NW
Washington, DC 20049

bjones@aarp.org
2024346091
Party name: AARP, AARP Foundation, Justice in Aging, National Organization of Social Security Claimants’ Representatives
Paul Robert Koster
    Counsel of Record
Emory Law School Supreme Court Advocacy Program
1301 Clifton Road
Atlanta, GA 30322

paul.koster@emory.edu
4047273957
Party name: League of United Latin American Citizens
Jorge Martinez-Luciano
    Counsel of Record
ML & RE Law Office
Cobian's Plaza, Suite 404
1607 Ponce De Leon Ave.
San Juan, PR 00909

jorge@mlrelaw.com
7879992972
Party name: Puerto Rico House of Representatives
Hiram Alberto Melendez-Juarbe
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 193063
San Juan, PR 00919-3063

hiram@melendezjuarbe.com
787-415-5192
Party name: University of Puerto Rico Amicus Justitiae Probono Project
John F. Nevares
    Counsel of Record
John F. Nevares & Associates
1225 Ponce De Leon Avenue
Vig Tower, Suite 1504
San Juan, PR 00907

jfnevares@nevareslaw.com
7877229333
Party name: Members of the Congressional Shadow Delegation of Puerto Rico
Edwin Quinones
    Counsel of Record
Quinones & Arbona Law Offices PSC
Doral Bank Plaza, 33 Calle Resolucion, Suite 701-A
San Juan, PR 00920

equinones@qaclaw.com
7876206776
Party name: Senate of Puerto Rico
Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
    Counsel of Record
Rabell Méndez C.S.P.
P.O. Box 195580
San Juan, PR 00919

jesusrabell@gmail.com
(787) 312-0259
Party name: Diálogo Por Puerto Rico
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Public Benefits Scholars
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
865 S. Figueroa St.
10th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(213) 443-3000
Party name: Plaintiffs in Peña Martínez v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Hector Torres
    Counsel of Record
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
1633 Broadway
New York, NY 10019

HTorres@kasowitz.com
(212) 506-1730
Party name: LatinoJustice PRLDEF, et al.
Reginald M. Turner Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Clark Hill, PLC
500 Woodward Ave
Suite 3500
Detroit, MI 48226

rturner@clarkhill.com
3139658318
Party name: American Bar Association
Isabel Abislaiman
    Counsel of Record
Isabel Abislaiman Law Offices
252 Calle Cruz
Suite 201
San Juan, PR 00901

abislaiman@gmail.com
(787) 525-6242
Party name: Plaintiff in Ruiz-Aviles v. SSA et al.
Dwyer Stenquist Arce
    Counsel of Record
Kutak Rock LLP
1650 Farnam Street
The Omaha Building
Omaha, NE 68102

Dwyer.Arce@KutakRock.com
402.346.6000
Party name: Virgin Islands Bar Association
Manuel Del Valle
    Counsel of Record
Interamerican Institute for Constitutional Rights
Urb. Industrial Calle Federico Costa #170
Interamerican School of Law
Hato Rey, PR 00918-1303

mdelvalle@juris.inter.edu
7877511912
Party name: Interamerican Institute for Constitutional Rights
Jose A. Hernandez-Mayoral
    Counsel of Record
Hernandez Mayoral Law Offices
206 Tetuan
Suite 702
San Juan, PR 00901

jose@hernandezmayoral.com
787-607-4867
Party name: Carlos Delgado Altieri, Mayor of the Municipality of Isabela, Puerto Rico
Gregorio IgartuaBox 3911
Aguadilla, PR 00605

bufeteigartua@yahoo.com
(787) 379-5095
Party name: Gregorio Igartua
Carlos Lugo-Fiol
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 260150
San Juan, PR 00926

clugofiol@gmail.com
(787) 645-4211
Party name: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Geoffrey M. WyattSkadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP
1440 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

geoffrey.wyatt@skadden.com
202-371-7008
Party name: American Bar Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543