Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-287 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-287 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Ernest Johnson, Petitioner
v.
Anne L. Precythe, et al.
Docketed:September 4, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2222)
   Decision Date:April 1, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 5, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 5, 2020 to November 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 4, 2020.
Nov 04 2020Brief of respondents Anne Precythe, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 23 2020Reply of petitioner Ernest Johnson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Dec 08 2020Rescheduled.
Jan 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Mar 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 29 2021The parties are directed to file supplemental letter briefs addressing the following question: Given that the District Court dismissed without prejudice, would petitioner be barred from filing a new complaint that proposes the firing squad as the alternative method of execution? The petitioner’s brief, not to exceed 5 pages, is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before Monday, April 12, 2021. The respondents’ brief, not to exceed 5 pages, is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before Monday, April 26, 2021.
Apr 12 2021Supplemental Letter of petitioner Ernest Johnson filed.
Main Document
Apr 26 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
Apr 26 2021Supplemental brief of respondents Anne Precythe, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021.
May 24 2021Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion) Justice Sotomayor, with whom Justice Breyer and Justice Kagan join, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ginger D. Anders
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

ginger.anders@mto.com
2022201107
Party name: Ernest Johnson
Attorneys for Respondents
Katharine Anne DolinOffice of the Missouri Attorney General
PO Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

katharine.dolin@ago.mo.gov
573-751-0475
Party name: Anne Precythe, et al.
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Supreme Court Building, 207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: Anne Precythe, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543