Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-273
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-273
Vide 20-271, 20-414, 20-74, 20-92
Title:Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Rovi Guides, Inc., et al.
Docketed:September 2, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1215, 2019-1216, 2019-1218, 2019-1293, 2019-1294, 2019-1295)
   Decision Date:April 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2020Memorandum of respondent Rovi Guides, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 20 2020Reply of petitioner Comcast Cable Communications, LLC filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 13 2020Motion of petitioner to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant Rule 46.2 filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 03 2020Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael E. Joffre
    Counsel of Record
STERNE, KESSLER, GOLDSTEIN & Fox P.L.L.C.
1100 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

mjoffre@sternekessler.com
202-772-8856
Party name: Rovi Guides, Inc.
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543