Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-27
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-27
Title:Jennifer Paskert, Petitioner
v.
Kemna-ASA Auto Plaza, Inc., dba Auto Smart of Spirit Lake, et al.
Docketed:July 20, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3623)
   Decision Date:February 13, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 19, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 19, 2020 to October 5, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 5, 2020, for all respondents.
Oct 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 5, 2020 to October 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 19, 2020, for all respondents.
Oct 16 2020Brief of respondents Kemna-ASA Auto Plaza, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 23 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from November 4, 2020 to November 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 28 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until November 10, 2020 granted.
Nov 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Nov 12 2020Reply of petitioner Jennifer Paskert filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Schnapper
    Counsel of Record
Univ. of Washington School of Law
P.O. Box 353020
Seattle, WA 98195

schnapp@uw.edu
206-616-3167
Party name: Jennifer Paskert
Attorneys for Respondents
Bret Alan Dublinske
    Counsel of Record
Fredrikson & Byron, P.A.
505 East Grand Avenue, Suite 200
Des Moines, IA 50309

bdublinske@fredlaw.com
5152428900
Party name: Kemna-ASA Auto Plaza, Inc., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543