Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-260
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-260
Title:Personal Audio, LLC, Petitioner
v.
CBS Corporation
Docketed:September 1, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2256)
   Decision Date:January 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 1, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2020)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 01 2020Brief of respondent CBS Corporation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 21 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/6/2020.
Nov 09 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Papool Subhash Chaudhari
    Counsel of Record
Chaudhari Law, PLLC
P.O. Box 1863
Wylie, TX 75098

papool@chaudharilaw.com
2147021150
Party name: Personal Audio LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Steven Lieberman
    Counsel of Record
Rothwell, Figg, Ernst & Manbeck, P.C.
607 14th St., NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20005

slieberman@rfem.com
202-783-6040
Party name: CBS Corporation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543