Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-258
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-258
Title:Alvin E. Medina, Petitioner
v.
Federal Aviation Administration
Docketed:September 1, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1033)
   Decision Date:February 28, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 30, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2020)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 23 2020Waiver of right of respondent FAA to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 19 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alvin E. Medina Sr.29254 Wagon Creek Lane
Menifee, CA 92584

951-746-4498
Party name: Alvin E. Medina
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: FAA

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543