Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-219
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-219
Title:Jane Cummings, Petitioner
v.
Premier Rehab Keller, P.L.L.C.
Docketed:August 25, 2020
Linked with 21A98
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-10169)
   Decision Date:January 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:March 24, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 21 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 24, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2020Brief of respondent Premier Rehab Keller, P.L.L.C. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.
Oct 14 2020Reply of petitioner Jane Cummings filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 02 2020The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration of this petition.
May 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 07 2021Supplemental brief of respondent Premier Rehab Keller, P.L.L.C. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2021.
Jul 02 2021Petition GRANTED.
Jul 08 2021Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 23, 2021. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 29, 2021.
Aug 11 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Jane Cummings.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 17 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Premier Rehab Keller, P.L.L.C.
Blanket Consent
Aug 23 2021Brief of petitioner Jane Cummings filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Jane Cummings
Blanket Consent
Aug 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 30 2021Brief amici curiae of Disability Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2021Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2021Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Sep 20 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, November 30, 2021.
Sep 27 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Sep 29 2021Brief of respondent Premier Rehab Keller, P.L.L.C. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 05 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Oct 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 06 2021Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 06 2021Brief amici curiae of The National Conference of State Legislatures, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 06 2021Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2021The record received from the U.S.D.C. Northern District of Texas is electronic and has been filed electronically.
Oct 18 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED, and the time is allotted as follows: 20 minutes for petitioner, 15 minutes for the Acting Solictor General, and 35 minutes for respondent.
Oct 19 2021Application (21A98) to extend the time to file a reply brief on the merits from October 29, 2021 to November 2, 2021, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 25 2021Application (21A98) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 2, 2021.
Oct 29 2021CIRCULATED
Nov 02 2021Reply of petitioner Jane Cummings filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2021Argued. For petitioner: Andrew Rozynski, New York, N. Y.; and Colleen R. Sinzdak, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Kannon K. Shanmugam, Washington, D. C.
Apr 28 2022Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Thomas, Alito, Gorsuch, Kavanaugh, and Barrett, JJ., joined. Kavanaugh, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Gorsuch, J., joined. Breyer, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Sotomayor and Kagan, JJ., joined.
May 23 2022Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 21 2022Rehearing DENIED.
Jun 24 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Rozynski
    Counsel of Record
Eisenberg & Baum, LLP
24 Union Square East, 4th Floor
New York, NY 10003

arozynski@eandblaw.com
2123538700
Party name: Jane Cummings
Attorneys for Respondent
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Premier Rehab Keller, P.L.L.C.
Brian Scott BradleyWatson, Caraway, Midkiff and Luningham, LLP
306 W. 7th Street, Suite 200
Fort Worth, TX 76102

sbradley@watsoncaraway.com
(817) 870-1717
Party name: Premier Rehab Keller, P.L.L.C.
Other
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Law Professors
Edwin Smiley Kneedler
    Counsel of Record
D.O.J.
10th & Constitution Ave
Washington, DC 20530

Judith.L.Reardon-Bridges@usdoj.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Robert S. Peck
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Litigation, PC
2117 Leroy Place, N.W.
Washington, DC 20008

robert.peck@cclfirm.com
2029442874
Party name: American Association for Justice
Elizabeth B. PrelogarSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Richard A. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
2050 M Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

rsimpson@wiley.law
202-719-7314
Party name: The National Conference of State Legislatures, et al.
Samuel Spital
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Edeucational Fund, Inc.
40 Rector Street
Fifth Floor
New York, NY 10006

sspital@naacpldf.org
212-965-2205
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund Inc., et al.
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: The States Of Texas, Alabama, Arkansas, Indiana, Louisiana, Mississippi, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Utah, And West Virginia
Raffi Melkonian
    Counsel of Record
Wright, Close & Barger LLP
1 Riverway, Suite 2200
Houston, TX 77056

melkonian@wrightclose.com
713-572-4321
Party name: Disability Organizations

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543