Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-193 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-193 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Calvin McMillan, Petitioner
v.
Alabama
Docketed:August 20, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama
   Case Numbers:(CR-17-0718)
   Decision Date:November 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 20, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 21, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 21, 2020 to October 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 10 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Calvin McMillan
Blanket Consent
Sep 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 21, 2020.
Sep 17 2020Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Innocence Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Francis Miles, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Alabama and Florida Circuit Court Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 02 2020Reply of petitioner Calvin McMillan filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 04 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 23 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Boland Admirand
    Counsel of Record
Southern Center for Human Rights
60 Walton Street NW
Atlanta, GA 30303

madmirand@schr.org
404-688-1202
Party name: Calvin McMillan
Attorneys for Respondent
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

edmund.lacour@alabamaag.gov
334-353-2196
Party name: Alabama
Other
James F. Bogan III
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
1100 Peachtree Street
Suite 2800
Atlanta, GA 30309-4530

jbogan@kilpatricktownsend.com
(404) 815-6500
Party name: Former Alabama and Florida Circuit Court Judges
G. Ben Cohen
    Counsel of Record
The Promise of Justice Initiative
1024 Elysian Fields
New Orleans, LA 70117

bcohen@defendla.org
504-529-5955
Party name: Francis Miles and Janet Johnson, Former Jurors in Alabama Whose Votes Judges Overrode
James Connolly Dugan
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019

jdugan@willkie.com
212-728-8654
Party name: The Innocence Project
Daniel Scott Harawa
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund
700 14th Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

dharawa@naacpldf.org
2022165563
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543