Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1800
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1800
Title:Harold Shurtleff, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Boston, Massachusetts, et al.
Docketed:June 24, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1158)
   Decision Date:January 22, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 26, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 23 2021Brief of respondents City of Boston, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Congressional Prayer Caucus Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 17 2021Reply of petitioners Harold Shurtleff, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2021Petition GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Counsel
PO Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

court@lc.org
407-875-1776
Party name: Harold Shurtleff, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert Stephen Arcangeli
    Counsel of Record
City of Boston Law Department
One City Hall Square, Room 615
Boston, MA 02201

robert.arcangeli@boston.gov
617-635-4044
Party name: City of Boston, et al.
Other
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Congressional Prayer Caucus Foundation, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543