Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1800
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1800
Title:Harold Shurtleff, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Boston, Massachusetts, et al.
Docketed:June 24, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1158)
   Decision Date:January 22, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 26, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 23 2021Brief of respondents City of Boston, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Congressional Prayer Caucus Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 17 2021Reply of petitioners Harold Shurtleff, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2021Petition GRANTED.
Oct 27 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Harold Shurtleff, et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 02 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, City of Boston, et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 12 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Harold Shurtleff, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 15 2021Brief of petitioners Harold Shurtleff, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, January 18, 2022.
Nov 17 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit.
Nov 17 2021Brief amicus curiae of Liberty, Life and Law Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Bronx Household of Faith filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Cornerstone Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Notre Dame Law School Religious Liberty Initiative filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of The American Legion filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Society filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Congressional Prayer Caucus Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Protect the First Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Advancing American Freedom and Faith & Freedom Coalition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Kentucky, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2021The record from the U.S.D.C. Dist. of Massachusetts is electronic and located on Pacer.
Nov 30 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Dec 14 2021CIRCULATED
Dec 15 2021Brief of respondents City of Boston, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 22 2021Brief amici curiae of National Council of the Churches of Christ in the USA, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Massachusetts, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Jewish Alliance for Law and Social Action, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Local Government Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Freedom From Religion Foundation and Center for Inquiry filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Anti-Defamation League filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.
Jan 07 2022Reply of Harold Shurtleff, et al. not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted)(January 11, 2022)
Jan 07 2022Reply of petitioners Harold Shurtleff, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Argued. For petitioners: Mathew Staver, Orlando, Fla.; and Sopan Joshi, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Counsel
PO Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

court@lc.org
407-875-1776
Party name: Harold Shurtleff, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
202-508-4776
Party name: City of Boston, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts
Richard L. Bolton
    Counsel of Record
Boardman and Clark LLP
1 South Pinckney Street
Suite 410
Madison, WI 53701

rbolton@boardmanclark.com
608-257-9521
Party name: Freedom From Religion Foundation and Center for Inquiry
Thomas L. Brejcha Jr.
    Counsel of Record
309 W Washington Street
Chicago, IL 60606

brejcha@aol.com
3127821680
Party name: Thomas More Society
Daniel H. Bromberg
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP
Four Embarcadero Center
22nd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

dan.bromberg@pillsburylaw.com
415 983-1000
Party name: National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, United States Conference of Mayors, International City/County Management Association, and International Municipal Lawyers Association
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Congressional Prayer Caucus Foundation, et al.
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
111 Magnolia Lane
Hubert, NC 28539

lawyerdeborah@outlook.com
9103264554
Party name: Liberty, Life and Law Foundation
Anthony John Dick
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

ajdick@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: American Cornerstone Institute
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
(334) 262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Scott William Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Elon University School of Law
201 North Greene Street
Greensboro, NC 27401

sgaylord@elon.edu
3362799331
Party name: CatholicVote.org Education Fund
Andrew Michael Grossman
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

agrossman@bakerlaw.com
2028611697
Party name: Bronx Household of Faith
Dorothy Alicia Hickok
    Counsel of Record
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
One Logan Square
Suite 2000
Philadelphia, PA 19103

alicia.hickok@faegredrinker.com
215-988-3364
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Protect the First Foundation
David Clark Kravitz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

david.kravitz@state.ma.us
6179632427
Party name: Massachusetts, Connecticut, Delaware, the District of Columbia, Hawaii, Maine, Minnesota, New York, Oregon, and Virginia
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Susan Leann Baker Manning
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

susan.manning@morganlewis.com
2023736172
Party name: Anti-Defamation League
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
2022613300
Party name: Notre Dame Law School Religious Liberty Initiative
Ryan Patrick McManus
    Counsel of Record
Hemenway & Barnes
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

rmcmanus@hembar.com
6175579705
Party name: Jewish Alliance for Law and Social Action, et al.
Brett Robert Nolan
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Kentucky Attorney General
700 Capital Avenue, Suite 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

brett.nolan@ky.gov
502-696-5300
Party name: Kentucky, Arizona, Arkansas, Georgia, Louisiana, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, South Carolina, Tennessee, Utah, and West Virginia
Charles Rothfeld
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K St NW
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3233
Party name: National Council of the Churches of Christ in the USA, et al.
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
First Liberty Institute, 2001 W Piano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: The American Legion
Matthew Jared Sheehan
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

matt@advancingamericanfreedom.com
(202) 780-4848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom and Faith & Freedom Coalition
Lori Halstead Windham
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

lwindham@becketlaw.org
202-349-7202
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543