Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-18
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-18
Title:Arthur Gregory Lange, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:July 14, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A157169)
   Decision Date:October 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 11, 2020
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 13, 2020 to September 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 14, 2020.
Aug 13 2020Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and California Attorneys for Criminal Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 14 2020Brief of respondent State of California in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Sep 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Sep 23 2020Reply of petitioner Arthur Gregory Lange filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 19 2020Petition GRANTED.
Oct 26 2020Amanda K. Rice, Esquire, of Ann Arbor, Michigan, is invited to brief and argue, as amicus curiae, in support of the judgment below.
Nov 05 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 05 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Arthur Gregory Lange.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 12 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix, petitioner's brief on the merits, and respondent's brief on the merits in support is extended to and including December 4, 2020. The time to file the brief of the Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below is extended to and including January 8, 2021.
Nov 23 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Dec 04 2020Brief of petitioner Arthur Gregory Lange filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2020Brief of respondent State of California in support of vacatur filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2020Brief amici curiae of DKT Liberty Project, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2020Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2020Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners of America, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, DownsizeDC.org, Downsize DC Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, and Restoring Liberty Action Committee filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2020Brief amici curiae of States of Illinois et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Project for Privacy & Surveillance Accountability and Restore the Fourth, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of National College for DUI Defense filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2020Motion for divided argument filed by petitioner Arthur Gregory Lange.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, February 24, 2021.
Jan 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2021Brief amici curiae of Sonoma County District Attorney’s Office and California District Attorneys Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Fraternal Order of Police filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2021CIRCULATED
Jan 14 2021Brief amici curiae of States of Ohio, Alabama, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of Los Angeles County Police Chiefs’ Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 15 2021Motion for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed by the Acting Solicitor General.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Steven Penney filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of Mothers Against Drunk Driving filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2021Record requested.
Jan 25 2021Motion for divided argument filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Jan 25 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Jan 28 2021Record received from the State of California Court of Appeal First Appellate District. The record is electronically filed.
Feb 05 2021Reply of petitioner Arthur Gregory Lange filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Reply of respondent State of California filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 24 2021Argued. For petitioner: Jeffrey L. Fisher, Stanford, Cal. For respondent supporting vacatur: Samuel T. Harbourt, Deputy Solicitor General, San Francisco, Cal. For Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below: Amanda K. Rice, Detroit, Mich. For United States, as amicus curiae, supporting affirmance: Erica L. Ross, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305-8610

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
(650) 724-7081
Party name: Arthur Gregory Lange
Attorneys for Respondent
Samuel Thomas Harbourt
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice, Office of the Solicitor General
455 Golden Gate Ave Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

Samuel.Harbourt@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3919
Party name: State of California
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: DKT Liberty Project, Law Enforcement Action Partnership, Reason Foundation, and Due Process Institute
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, et al.
Spencer Ralph Brady
    Counsel of Record
Office of the District Attorney, Sonoma County, Ca
600 Administrative Drive
Room 212J
Santa Rosa, CA 95403

DA-Appeals@sonoma-county.org
707-565-2311
Party name: Sonoma County District Attorney’s Office and California District Attorneys Association
David John Debold
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

ddebold@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8551
Party name: Professor Steven Penney
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: States of Ohio, Alabama, Arkansas, Idaho, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, and Utah
Elaine Janet GoldenbergMunger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

elaine.goldenberg@mto.com
202-220-1114
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and California Attorneys for Criminal Justice
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and California Attorneys for Criminal Justice
Larry H. James
    Counsel of Record
Crabbe Brown & James, LLP
500 S Front St
12th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215

ljames@cbjlawyers.com
614-229-4567
Party name: National Fraternal Order of Police
Jane Elinor Notz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

jnotz@atg.state.il.us
312-814-5376
Party name: States of Illinois et al.
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, DownsizeDC.org, Downsize DC Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, and Restoring Liberty Action Committee
Donald John Ramsell
    Counsel of Record
Ramsell & Associates LLC
128 S. County Farm Rd
Wheaton, IL 60187-2400

donald.ramsell@dialdui.com
(630) 665-8780
Party name: National College for DUI Defense
Amanda Kelly Rice
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
150 W. Jefferson Ave., Suite 2100
Detroit, MI 48226

arice@jonesday.com
313-230-7926
Party name: Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Project for Privacy & Surveillance Accountability and Restore the Fourth, Inc.
Barbara Anne Smith
    Counsel of Record
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
211 North Broadway, Suite 3600
St. Louis, MO 63102

barbara.smith@bclplaw.com
314-259-2367
Party name: Mothers Against Drunk Driving
J. Scott Tiedemann
    Counsel of Record
Liebert Cassidy Whitmore
6033 W. Century Blvd., Suite 500
Los Angeles, CA 90045

stiedemann@lcwlegal.com
310-981-2022
Party name: Los Angeles County Police Chiefs’ Association
Ethan Haller Townsend
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

ehtownsend@mwe.com
(202) 756-8000
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Joshua Aaron Windham
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

jwindham@ij.org
7047121490
Party name: Institute for Justice

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543