Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1786
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1786
Title:JoAnne Troesch, et al., Petitioners
v.
Chicago Teachers Union, et al.
Docketed:June 23, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1525)
   Decision Date:April 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 23, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2021Waiver of right of respondent Board of Education of the City of Chicago to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 11 2021Waiver of right of respondents Chicago Teachers Union, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Jul 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Goldwater Institute; Cato Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Freedom Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2021Brief amici curiae of States of Alaska, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Response Requested. (Due August 26, 2021)
Aug 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 26, 2021 to September 27, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 27, 2021, for all respondents.
Aug 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Jason Kohute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 27 2021Brief of respondents Chicago Teachers Union, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 27 2021Brief of respondent Board of Education of the City of Chicago in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 13 2021Reply of petitioners JoAnne Troesch, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William L. Messenger
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

wlm@nrtw.org
7033218510
Party name: JoAnne Troesch, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas Arthur Doyle
    Counsel of Record
Board of Education of the City of Chicago (Law Department)
1 North Dearborn
9th Floor
Chicago, IL 60602

tadoyle2@cps.edu
7735531720
Party name: Board of Education of the City of Chicago
Joshua B. Shiffrin
    Counsel of Record
Bredhoff & Kaiser PLLC
805 15th Street Northwest
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

jshiffrin@bredhoff.com
2028422600
Party name: Chicago Teachers Union, et al.
Other
Matthew Conrad Forys
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
19415 Deerfield Avenue, Suite 312
Leesburg, VA 20176

matt@landmarklegal.org
703-554-6100
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Nathan John McGrath
    Counsel of Record
The Fairness Center
500 North Third Street
Suite 600B
Harrisburg, PA 17101

njmcgrath@fairnesscenter.org
844.293.1001
Party name: Jason Kohute and Carol Shaner
James Gideon Abernathy
    Counsel of Record
Freedom Foundation
PO Box 552
Olympia, WA 98507

JAbernathy@freedomfoundation.com
3609563482
Party name: Freedom Foundation
John Michael Connolly
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd
Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22209

mike@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: States of Alaska, Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, and West Virginia
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jhuebert@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute; Cato Institute
Jeffrey Michael Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
141 West Jackson Street, #1065
Chicago, IL 60604

jschwab@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543