Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1778
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1778
Vide 20-1530, 20-1531, 20-1780
Title:Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC, Petitioner
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:June 23, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188)
   Decision Date:January 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 18 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 23, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC
Blanket Consent
Jul 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 23, 2021 to August 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 5, 2021, for all respondents.
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents Non-Governmental Organization and Trade Association Respondents in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents Federal respondents in opposition filed. VIDED.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents States and Municipalities in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 24 2021Reply of petitioner Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 29 2021Petition GRANTED limited to Question 2 presented by the petition. The petitions for writs of certiorari in No. 20-1530, No. 20-1531, and No. 20-1780 are granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. The motion of Lignite Energy Council for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae in No. 20-1780 is granted. VIDED.
Nov 04 2021Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-1530. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-1530. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Michael Grossman
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

agrossman@bakerlaw.com
2028611697
Party name: Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, and Sacramento Municipal Utility District
Sean Hoe Donahue
    Counsel of Record
Donahue, Goldberg & Littleton
1008 Pennsylvania Avenue, SE
Washington, DC 20003

sean@donahuegoldberg.com
2022777085
Party name: Non-Governmental Organization and Trade Association Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: States and Municipalities
Other
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543