Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1767
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1767
Title:Sarasota Wine Market, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Eric S. Schmitt, Attorney General of Missouri, et al.
Docketed:June 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1948)
   Decision Date:February 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:March 24, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 21, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2021Waiver of right of respondents Eric Schmitt, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Jul 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Wine Retailers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2021Brief amici curiae of 22 Wine Consumers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 11 2021Response Requested. (Due September 10, 2021)
Sep 10 2021Brief of respondents Eric Schmitt, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2021Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James Alexander Tanford
    Counsel of Record
Epstein Cohen Seif & Porter LLP
50 S. Meridian St.
Suite 505
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tanford@indiana.edu
812-332-4966
Party name: Sarasota Wine Market, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Supreme Court Building, 207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: Eric Schmitt, et al.
Other
Sean M. O'Leary
    Counsel of Record
O'Leary Law and Policy Gr
806 North Kenilworth Avenue
Elmhurst, IL 60126

sean.o@irishliquorlawyer.com
7734906738
Party name: National Association of Wine Retailers
J. Gregory Troutman
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Law Office, PLLC.
4205 Springhurst Boulevard
Suite 201
Louisville, KY 40241

jgtatty@yahoo.com
5027419491
Party name: 22 Wine Consumers as Amici Curiae in Support of Petitioners

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543