Docket for 20-1732
 | |
|
Jun 10 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 15, 2021) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 07 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 15, 2021 to August 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 08 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 16, 2021. | | | Jul 15 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of FAMM filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jul 15 2021 | Brief amici curiae of Rachel E. Barkow and Brent E. Newton filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 15 2021 | Brief amici curiae of The American Conservative Union Foundation Nolan Center for Justice, The Cato Institute filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 09 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 16, 2021 to September 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Aug 10 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 15, 2021. | | | Sep 08 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 15, 2021 to October 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 09 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 15, 2021. | | | Oct 14 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 15, 2021 to October 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 15 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 22, 2021. | | | Oct 22 2021 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Proof of ServiceMain Document | Nov 08 2021 | Reply of petitioner Thomas Bryant, Jr. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 09 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021. | | | Dec 06 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|