Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1726
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1726
Title:Roy J. Meidinger, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1518)
   Decision Date:March 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 15, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 12 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.
Oct 19 2021Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 09 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Dec 06 2021Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roy Meidinger14893 American Eagle Court
Fort Myers, FL 33912

(239) 694-5597
Party name: Roy J. Meidinger
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543