Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1725
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1725
Title:David Seidemann, et al., Petitioners
v.
Professional Staff Congress Local 2334, et al.
Docketed:June 14, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-460)
   Decision Date:January 11, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 14, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, David Seidemann, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jun 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 14, 2021 to August 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 6, 2021.
Jul 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents National Education Association, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 27 2021Reply of petitioners David Seidemann, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Bursch Law PLLC
9339 Cherry Valley SE, #78
Caledonia, MI 49316

jbursch@burschlaw.com
(616) 450-4235
Party name: David Seidemann, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Scott A. Kronland
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

skronland@altshulerberzon.com
415-421-7151
Party name: National Education Association
Other
Raymond J. LaJeunesse Jr.
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
8001 Braddock Rd, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22151

rjl@nrtw.org
703-321-8510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
Jeffrey Michael Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
141 West Jackson Street, Suite 1065
Chicago, IL 60604

jschwab@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543