Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-171
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-171
Title:Isaac L. Hobbs, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 17, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3343)
   Decision Date:March 20, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 16, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 16, 2020 to October 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 16, 2020.
Oct 16 2020Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 04 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 16 2020Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Dominic Meuti
    Counsel of Record
Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff LLP
200 Public Square, Ste 2300
Cleveland, OH 44114

mmeuti@beneschlaw.com
12163636246
Party name: Isaac Hobbs
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543