Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1693
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1693
Title:Erick Allen Osby, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 7, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-4789)
   Decision Date:December 31, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 7, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2021Brief amici curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation, National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, Dream Corps Justice, and R Street Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Jul 07 2021Brief amici curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders and FAMM filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2021Brief amici curiae of Former Federal District Court Judges and Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Caroline Swift Platt
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
1650 King Street, Suite 500
Alexandria, VA 22314

caroline_platt@fd.org
703-600-0810
Party name: Erick Allen Osby
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Christopher D. Man
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
1901 L Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

cman@winston.com
202-282-5622
Party name: Former Federal District Court Judges and Law Professors
Michael David Pepson
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22201

mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation, National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, Dream Corps Justice, and R Street Institute
Jonathan Podolsky Schneller
    Counsel of Record
O' Melveny & Myers
400 S. Hope St., 18th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

jschneller@omm.com
213-430-8115
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders and FAMM
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543