Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1690
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1690
Title:Ramon Cortesluna, Petitioner
v.
Daniel Rivas-Villegas, et al.
Docketed:June 7, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15105)
   Decision Date:October 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 3, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 7, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2021Waiver of right of respondent Daniel Rivas-Villegas to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 18 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert George Howie
    Counsel of Record
Howie & Smith, LLP
1777 Borel Place, Suite 1000
San Mateo, CA 94402

showie@howielaw.com
6506859300
Party name: Ramon Cortesluna
Attorneys for Respondents
Timothy Towery Coates
    Counsel of Record
Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP
5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90036

tcoates@gmsr.com
(310) 859-7811
Party name: Daniel Rivas-Villegas

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543