Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1678
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1678
Vide 20-1520
Title:Daniel Z. Crowe, et al., Petitioners
v.
Oregon State Bar, et al.
Docketed:June 2, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35463)
   Decision Date:February 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Daniel Crowe, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jun 03 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Oregon State Bar, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jun 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of Lawyers United Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 24 2021Waiver of Oregon State Bar, et al. of right to respond not accepted for filing. (June 25, 2021)
Jun 25 2021Waiver of right of respondent Oregon State Bar, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of First Liberty Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Jun 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of 1889 Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Mackinac Center for Public Policy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 02 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pelican Institute for Public Policy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 02 2021Brief amicus curiae of Protect the 1st, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 08 2021Supplemental brief of petitioners Daniel Crowe, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jhuebert@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Daniel Crowe, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Steven M. Wilker
    Counsel of Record
Tonkon Torp LLP
888 SW Fifth Avenue
Suite 1600
Portland, OR 97204

steven.wilker@tonkon.com
5038022040
Party name: Oregon State Bar, et al.
Other
Joseph Robert Giannini
    Counsel of Record
Joseph Robert Giannini
12016 Wilshire Blvd #5
#5
Los Angeles, CA 90025

j.r.giannini@verizon.net
3108041814
Party name: Lawyers United Inc.
Sarah Elizabeth Roy Harbison
    Counsel of Record
Pelican Instititue for Public Policy
400 Poydras St., Suite 900
New Orleans, LA 70130

sarah@pelicaninstitute.org
5049528016
Party name: Pelican Institute for Public Policy
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Found., Cato Inst., and Atlantic Legal Found.
Raymond J. LaJeunesse Jr.
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Foundation
8001 Braddock Rd, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22151

rjl@nrtw.org
703-321-8510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Gainesville, GA 30501

jackparklaw@gmail.com
470-892-6444
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Charles Stephen Rogers
    Counsel of Record
3000 W. Memorial Road, Ste. 123, Box 403
Oklahoma City, OK 73120

crogers740@gmail.com
(405) 742-7700
Party name: 1889 Institute
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Protect the 1st, Inc.
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
2001 W Plano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: First Liberty Institute
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
208 South LaSalle Street
Suite 1690
Chicago, IL 60604

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Patrick J. Wright
    Counsel of Record
Mackinac Center for Public Policy
140 West Main Street
Midland, MI 48640

wright@mackinac.org
9894303912
Party name: Mackinac Center for Public Policy

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543