Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1676
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1676
Title:Public Watchdogs, Petitioner
v.
Southern California Edison Company, et al.
Docketed:June 2, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-56531)
   Decision Date:December 29, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 28 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Public Watchdogs.
Blanket Consent
Jun 16 2021Waiver of right of respondent Southern California Edison Company, SanDiego Gas & Electric Company, and Sempra Energy to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 01 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 01 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Environmental Advocacy Clinic at Northwestern Pritzker School of Law.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 02 2021Response Requested. (Due September 1, 2021)
Aug 25 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from September 1, 2021 to October 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 25 2021Motion of Southern California Edison Company, et al. to extend the time to file a response from September 1, 2021 to October 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 26 2021The motions to extend the time to file a response are granted and the time is extended to and including October 1, 2021, for all respondents.
Sep 27 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2021 to November 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2021Motion of Southern California Edison Company, et al. to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2021 to November 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 28 2021The motions to extend the time to file a response are granted and the time is further extended to and including November 1, 2021, for all respondents. (Docket entry corrected 9/29/21)
Oct 29 2021Brief of respondents Southern California Edison Company, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 15 2021Reply of petitioner Public Watchdogs filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Dec 06 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Environmental Advocacy Clinic at Northwestern Pritzker School of Law GRANTED.
Dec 06 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Eugene Casey
    Counsel of Record
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
201 S. Main St.
Suite 400
South Bend, IN 46601

brian.casey@btlaw.com
574-233-1171
Party name: Public Watchdogs, A California 501(C)(3) Corporation
Attorneys for Respondents
Edward J Casey
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird LLP
333 South Hope Street
16th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ed.Casey@alston.com
213-576-1005
Party name: Southern California Edison Company, SanDiego Gas & Electric Company, and Sempra Energy
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Nancy C. Loeb
    Counsel of Record
Northwestern University School of Law
375 E. Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 60611

n-loeb@northwestern.edu
312-503-0052
Party name: Environmental Advocacy Clinic at Northwestern Pritzker School of Law

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543