Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1675
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1675
Title:Melvin L. Phillips, Individually and as Trustee for Melvin L. Phillips, Sr., et al., Petitioners
v.
Oneida Indian Nation
Docketed:June 2, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2737-cv)
   Decision Date:November 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 30, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 28 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jun 07 2021Waiver of right of respondent Oneida Indian Nation to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 21 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Congressperson Claudia Tenney. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 22 2021Response to motion from respondent Oneida Indian Nation filed.
Main Document
Jun 28 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Congressperson Claudia Tenney GRANTED.
Jun 28 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Woodruff Lee Carroll
    Counsel of Record
Woodruff Lee Carroll P.C.
334 Nottingham Road
Syracuse, NY 13210

Carrollcarroll@carrolloffice.com
315 474 5356
Party name: Melvin Phillips, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael R. Smith
    Counsel of Record
Zuckerman, Spaeder, et al.
1800 M Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036-0000

msmith@zuckerman.com
(202) 778-1832
Party name: Oneida Indian Nation
Other
David Henry Tennant
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of David Tennant PLLC
3349 Monroe Avenue
Suite 345
Rochester NY, NY 14618

david.tennant@appellatezealot.com
5852816682
Party name: Congressperson Claudia Tenney

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543