Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-167
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-167
Title:Lilibeth Michelson, Petitioner
v.
Department of the Army
Docketed:August 18, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1811)
   Decision Date:May 11, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 17, 2020)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Aug 26 2020Waiver of right of respondent Dept. of the Army to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lillibeth Michelson105 Boyton Boulevard
Daytona Beach, FL 32118

386-299-8099
Party name: Lilibeth Michelson
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Dept. of the Army

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543