Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1668
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1668
Title:City of Tahlequah, Oklahoma, et al., Petitioners
v.
Austin P. Bond, as Special Administrator of the Estate of Dominic F. Rollice, Deceased
Docketed:June 1, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-7056)
   Decision Date:December 1, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 28, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2021 to July 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 17 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Sheriffs' Association.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 15, 2021.
Jun 30 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Police Association.
Main DocumentMain DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2021Amicus brief of National Fraternal Order of Police not accepted for filing. (July 02, 2021)
Jun 30 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Fraternal Order of Police.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 15 2021Brief of respondent Austin P. Bond in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 04 2021Reply of petitioners City of Tahlequah, Oklahoma, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2021Record Requested.
Aug 25 2021Record received from the U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit (flash drive).
Aug 31 2021Record received from the U.S.D.C. for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. The record is available on PACER.
Sep 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 18 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Sheriffs' Association GRANTED.
Oct 18 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Police Association GRANTED.
Oct 18 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Fraternal Order of Police GRANTED.
Oct 18 2021Petition GRANTED. Judgment REVERSED. Opinion per curiam. (Detached Opinion)
Nov 19 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Erin E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

erin.murphy@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: City of Tahlequah, Oklahoma, et al.
Paul D. ClementKirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: City of Tahlequah, Oklahoma, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
David Michael Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 60611

david.shapiro@law.northwestern.edu
312-503-0711
Party name: Austin P. Bond
Other
Gregory Charles Champagne
    Counsel of Record
St. Charles Parish Sheriff's Office
260 Judge Edward Dufresne Parkway
Luling, LA 70070

SheriffGC@stcharlessheriff.org
985-783-0204
Party name: National Sheriffs' Association
Larry H. James
    Counsel of Record
Crabbe Brown & James
500 South Front Street
Suite 1200
Columbus, OH 43202

ljames@cbjlawyers.com
614-229-4567
Party name: National Fraternal Order of Police
Robert S. Lafferrandre
    Counsel of Record
Pierce Couch Hendirckson Baysinger & Green, LLP
1109 N. Francis Avenue
Oklahoma City, OK 73106

rlafferrandre@piercecouch.com
(405) 235-1611
Party name: National Police Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543